Stoves v. Santander Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Tylor Stoves
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A. and Transunion, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02904
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Transunion, LLC 10/11/2019.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transunion, LLC, filed.(Sauls, Justin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Transunion, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sauls, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Transunion, LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019, filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George C Hanks, Jr, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-3. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Santander Bank, N.A. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019, filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tylor Stoves, filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Transunion, LLC, filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Santander Bank, N.A., filed.(Jaffer, Shawn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22927235) filed by Tylor Stoves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoves v. Santander Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylor Stoves
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Represented By: Justin Kristopher Sauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?