Brown et al
Defendant: Tamarah Fedoruk
Appellant: Oneruk, Inc. 401k Profit Sharing Plan, Ethan Brown, Guerison Interests, LLP, Oneruk, Inc. and EC Squared, PLLC
In Re: Christopher D. Fedoruk
Case Number: 4:2019cv02955
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Rodney Drinnon for Transcript of Motion Hearings on 2/12/19, 2/26/19 & 3/27/19 before Judge Rodriguez. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Access Transcripts, filed. (Wilson, Brittene) Electronically forwarded copy order to Access Transcripts. Modified on 9/16/2019 (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal, filed by Ethan Brown, EC Squared, PLLC, Guerison Interests, LLP, Oneruk, Inc., Oneruk, Inc. 401k Profit Sharing Plan. (Wilson, Brittene)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Certificate of Service re: #3 Response in Opposition to Motion by Tamarah Fedoruk, Christopher D. Fedoruk, filed. (Koenig, Julie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal, filed by Christopher D. Fedoruk, Tamarah Fedoruk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Koenig, Julie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Ethan Brown, EC Squared, PLLC, Guerison Interests, LLP, Oneruk, Inc., Oneruk, Inc. 401k Profit Sharing Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/30/2019. Originally Filed in case 18-33447 on 8/6/2019.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 8/6/2019, Ethan Brown, Guerison Interests, LLP, EC Squared, PLLC, Oneruk, Inc., Oneruk, Inc. 401k Profit Sharing Plan filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth Hoyt, Civil Action 19-2955. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oneruk, Inc. 401k Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Brittene V. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ethan Brown
Represented By: Brittene V. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Guerison Interests, LLP
Represented By: Brittene V. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oneruk, Inc.
Represented By: Brittene V. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: EC Squared, PLLC
Represented By: Brittene V. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Christopher D. Fedoruk
Represented By: Julie Mitchell Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamarah Fedoruk
Represented By: Julie Mitchell Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?