AGONOW LLC v. Essendant Industrial LLC d/b/a ORS Nasco
Plaintiff: AGONOW LLC
Defendant: ESSENDANT INDUSTRIAL LLC d/b/a ORS NASCO and Essendant Industrial LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02980
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses re: #5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols by AGONOW LLC, filed. (McKnight, Colleen)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. (Laytin, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Essendant Industrial LLC. (Laytin, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by AGONOW LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKnight, Colleen)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Kate E. Gehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Kate E. Gehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AGONOW LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2019. (McKnight, Colleen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AGONOW LLC, filed.(McKnight, Colleen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed.(DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Protective Order. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Kate Guilfoyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Daniel E. Laytin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed.(DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss , filed.(DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED EXHIBITS Ex. 2 to Memorandum in Support of re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. (DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed.(DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Kate Guilfoyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel E. Laytin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (DePaulo, Tabitha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha J. DePaulo on behalf of Essendant Industrial LLC, filed. (DePaulo, Tabitha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Essendant Industrial LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019, filed.(McKnight, Colleen)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Essendant Industrial LLC d/b/a Ors Nasco. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ESSENDANT INDUSTRIAL LLC d/b/a ORS NASCO, filed.(McKnight, Colleen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESSENDANT INDUSTRIAL LLC d/b/a ORS NASCO (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22953237) filed by AGONOW LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKnight, Colleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGONOW LLC v. Essendant Industrial LLC d/b/a ORS Nasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGONOW LLC
Represented By: Kate Gehl
Represented By: Craig D Dillard
Represented By: Colleen McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSENDANT INDUSTRIAL LLC d/b/a ORS NASCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essendant Industrial LLC
Represented By: Kate Guilfoyle
Represented By: Daniel E Laytin
Represented By: Tabitha Joy DePaulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?