United States of America v. Lot 26, Block 1, Meadow Farms
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Lot 26, Block 1, Meadowview Farms
Case Number: 4:2019cv03002
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to Brenda Martinez on 9/25/19 re: Personal Service, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of Post & Walk Executed as to Lot 26, Block 1, Meadowview Farms served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Martinez, Abran)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lot 26, Block 1, Meadowview Farms filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Martinez, Abran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lot 26, Block 1, Meadow Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lot 26, Block 1, Meadowview Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Abran Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?