B v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: R B
Defendant: Kalyn Cavazos, Terri Allison, James Hanson, Jennifer M Smith, Candice Lott, Anne Reber and Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown
Case Number: 4:2019cv03004
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Henry Carl Myers terminated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed.(Abrams, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for H. Carl Myers to Withdraw as Attorney by Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina M. Moreno on behalf of Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. (Moreno, Cristina)
October 2, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Engel, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by William Holtz on behalf of R B, filed. (Holtz, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of forwarding to all counsel judge's procedures by R B, filed. (Holtz, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Holtz, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Holtz, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Holtz, James)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Expedited Discovery.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Continuance. Based on the parties stipulation, the hearing is vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Abrams on behalf of Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. (Abrams, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Continuance of TRO Hearing by Terri Allison, Kalyn Cavazos, James Hanson, Candice Lott, Anne Reber, Jennifer M Smith, Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Agreed Discovery Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Myers, Henry)
August 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Certificate of Service for Court Notice setting Hearing, Orders and Certificates of Service by R B, filed. (Holtz, James)
August 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Certificate of Service for Pro Hac Vice Motions by R B, filed. (Holtz, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 8/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge David Hittner, filed. (ealexander, 4)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Joshua Engel to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Anne Tamashasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Certificate of Service re: #1 Complaint by R B, filed. (Holtz, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by R B, filed.(Holtz, James)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Anne Tamashasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Holtz, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Joshua Engel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Holtz, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Discovery by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Expedited Limited Discovery)(Holtz, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION To proceed Anonymously by R B, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtz, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019.), First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by R B, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In support of TRO)(Holtz, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22963093) filed by R B. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holtz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalyn Cavazos
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Allison
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hanson
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer M Smith
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Lott
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Reber
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Upshaw-Brown
Represented By: Henry Carl Myers
Represented By: Cristina Maria Moreno
Represented By: Michael Raphael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R B
Represented By: James William Holtz
Represented By: Joshua Adam Engel
Represented By: William Wright Holtz
Represented By: Anne Tamashasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?