Lucas
Appellant: Kenyatta Lucas
Appellee: Rodney Tow
Case Number: 4:2019cv03006
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, filed by Kenyatta Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Rodney Tow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Kenyatta Lucas, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Appeal, #2 Proposed Order Denying Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, , filed by Ja'Nekia W. Barton on behalf of Kenyatta Lucas. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, by Rodney Tow, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koenig, Julie)
August 13, 2019 Initial Appeal Filing fee: $298.00 re: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court,, receipt number 189416, filed. (jholguin, 4)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 12-35788, Kenyatta Lucas filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, Civil Action 4:19-cv-03006. Parties notified, filed.(SamanthaWarda, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Appeal) (SamanthaWarda, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenyatta Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rodney Tow
Represented By: Julie Mitchell Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?