Sorey v. Cenikor Foundation
Plaintiff: Marlon Woods, Ashley Rogers, Adam Ross Johnson, Esteban Collins, David Dupuis, Samuel Wayne Cutrer, Chris Mendow, John London, Stuart Baye, Jeremiah J. Harrison, Gregory Sorey, Ginamarie Samudio-Penick, Austen Brown, Suzanne Babin, Lecretia Fraser, Charles Evan, Beau Lirette, Ronnie Williams, Mattie Daniels, Dustin Carroll, Jay Arthur Prejean, Alester Williams and Katrina White
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03033
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing FLSA Consent of Hillary Sepulvado by Gregory Sorey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flowerree, Zachary)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting #69 Motion to Stay Briefing.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
October 1, 2019 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Gregory Sorey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flowerree, Zachary)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to File excess pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 27, 2019 Filing 67 SEALED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF GREGORY SOREY'S MOTION FOR STEP-ONE NOTICE UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT re: #12 by Cenikor Foundation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Gregory, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limit by Cenikor Foundation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gregory, David)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Andrew D. Bizer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Garret S. DeReus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE Of Filing FLSA Consent of Adam Featherston by Gregory Sorey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flowerree, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Garret S. DeReus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Sorey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (sgonzalez, 5)
September 3, 2019 *** Motion hearing and initial conference cancelled pending ruling on motion to consolidate in 4-19cv1583, filed. (arrivera, 4)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 MOTION for Emily A. Westermeier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
August 29, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Andrew D. Bizer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Sorey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Emily A. Westermeier to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Sorey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Westermeier, Emily)
August 27, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Setting as to #57 Notice (Other). Parties notified. Initial Conference and Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Cenikor Foundation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Gregory, David)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Sorey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Flowerree, Zachary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Sorey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Werman, Douglas)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
August 14, 2019 Filing 51 Case transferred in from Louisiana Middle. Case Number 3:19-cv-00267; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (NLT)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Motion to Change Venue to First-to-File Court (Doc. 39) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Civil Action No. 19-cv-00268-BAJ-RLB is TRANSFERRED to Judge Keith Ellison in the Southern District of Texas. The Court further notes that a Joint Motion to Change Venue to First-to File Court (Doc. 43) is pending in Civil Action No. 19-cv-00267-BAJ-RLB and a Joint Motion to Change Venue to First-to-File Court (Doc. 28) is pending in Civil Action No. 19-cv-00294-BAJ-RLB. Because both cases also involve issues substantially similar to those in the Klick case, both motions are GRANTED. Civil Action No. 19-cv-00267-BAJ-RLB and Civil Action No. 19-cv-00294-BAJ-RLB are TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT)
July 19, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
July 8, 2019 Filing 46 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is CANCELLED. Upon a Ruling on the Joint Motion to Change Venue, the parties shall contact chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. at (225) 389-3602 to reset the scheduling conference, if necessary. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 1, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. Status of CA 19cv267-BAJ; 19cv268-BAJ; and 19cv294-BAJ discussed. Ruling on pending motions deferred until issuances of Ruling on Motion to Transfer. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 45 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Notice Regarding Potential Mootness of Motions in Light of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to First to File Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(DeReus, Garret)
June 27, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
June 27, 2019 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to First-to-File Court by Gregory Sorey and by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Knapp, Bradley)
June 27, 2019 Filing 42 Joint Initial STATUS REPORT by Defendant and by All Plaintiffs. (DeReus, Garret) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney. Zachary C. Flowerree is hereby designated as lead counsel for plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Consolidate Case with 3:19-cv-00268; and 3:19-cv-00294 and Appointment of Lead Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Flowerree, #3 Exhibit 2 - Werman, #4 Exhibit 3 - DeReus, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret)
June 21, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret)
June 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The Civil Action Nos. 19-cv-267, 19-cv-268 and 19-cv-294 are set for a Status Conference on 7/1/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/19/2019. (EDC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion to Designate Lead Attorney. Attorney David M. Gregory shall be designated as lead counsel for defendant Cenikor Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 18, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cenikor Foundation. (Gregory, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 34 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cenikor Foundation.(Gregory, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Designate Lead Attorney by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gregory, David)
June 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #33 Unopposed MOTION to Designate Lead Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
June 3, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (DCB)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court notes the above captioned matters all include Fair Labor Standards Act claims by similarly situated Plaintiffs who attended Defendant's residential rehabilitation facility. Considering Local Rule 3(b), all civil matters, which involve subject matter that comprises all or a material part of the subject matter or cooperative facts of another action, shall be transferred to the section with the lowest docket number. Civil Case Number 3:19-00268-JWD-RLB is transferred from Judge John W. deGravelles to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Further, Civil Case Number 3:19-00294-SDD-RLB is transferred from Judge Shelly D. Dick to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Further, the #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer Motion in Civil Case Number 3:19-00267-BAJ-RLB is GRANTED and Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion is extended through 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/31/2019. (SWE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION re #12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Cenikor Foundation. (Knapp, Bradley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's #27 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #12 MOTION for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Gregory Sorey. (DeReus, Garret) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #12 MOTION for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #12 MOTION for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Motion for David Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Andrew Reed, to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Gregory, Christopher Dove, Andrew Reed and Frank Sommerville are hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendant Cenikor Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Ex Parte Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Cenikor Foundation is granted a 21-day extension of time until and including 6/18/2019 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 Ex Parte MOTION for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946688), #23 Ex Parte MOTION for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946650). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946688) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 Ex Parte MOTION for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946650) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (SGO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945811) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel David Gregory to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945804) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Complaint, by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Ex Parte MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Ex Parte MOTION for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945811). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #19 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel David Gregory to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Gregory Sorey (DeReus, Garret)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Sorey. Cenikor Foundation served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Attorney Emily Anne Westermeier added as co-counsel for Plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(DeReus, Garret)
May 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Emily A. Westermeier as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bizer, Andrew)
May 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Emily A. Westermeier as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Douglas M. Werman and Zachary C. Flowerree are hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO)
May 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936867). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936835). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936867) by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(DeReus, Garret)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936835) by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(DeReus, Garret)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cenikor Foundation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cenikor Foundation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935621.), filed by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Executed Consent Form)(DeReus, Garret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorey v. Cenikor Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Woods
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Rogers
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ross Johnson
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Collins
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dupuis
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Wayne Cutrer
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mendow
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John London
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Baye
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah J. Harrison
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sorey
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Represented By: Zachary C Flowerree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginamarie Samudio-Penick
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austen Brown
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Babin
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecretia Fraser
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Evan
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Lirette
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Williams
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Daniels
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Carroll
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Arthur Prejean
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alester Williams
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina White
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation
Represented By: Karen T Bordelon
Represented By: Joel P Babineaux
Represented By: Christopher Benjamin Dove
Represented By: David Mitchell Gregory
Represented By: Andrew Wilson Reed
Represented By: Bradley Clay Knapp
Represented By: Frank Sommerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?