The Grand Ltd
Appellant: The Grand Ltd
In Re: Richard Schmidt and Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03035
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Abate by The Grand Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridulfo, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Motion for Certification of Direct Appeal to The United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by The Grand Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2019. (Ridulfo, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 9/10/2019, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned to Judge Lee H. Rosenthal, Civil Action 19-3035. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #2 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 TRANSCRIPT re: Status Conference held on 1/14/2019 before Judge Unassigned. Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext. Ordering Party Michael P Ridulfo Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2019., filed. (VeritextLegalSolutions, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 8/12/2019, The Grand Ltd filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Lee H Rosenthal, Civil Action 4:19-cv-03035. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SamanthaWarda, 4) Richard Schmidt was incorrectly listed as the debtor. The corrected notice has been issued. (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (SamanthaWarda, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Grand Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Grand Ltd
Represented By: John Joseph Kane
Represented By: Michael P Ridulfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Richard Schmidt
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Gleit
Represented By: John James Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Gleit
Represented By: John James Sparacino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?