Brown v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew Brown
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03042
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Having been advised that Brown wishes to dismiss this case, it is dismissed without prejudice #6 . Case terminated on 10/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Matthew Brown, filed. (Newark, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by B. David L. Foster on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. (Foster, Benjamin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brazos County District Court, case number 19-002132-CV-361 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22984923) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - State Court File, #5 Exhibit E - Brazos CAD)(Durell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brown
Represented By: Robert C Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?