Bauer v. Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Plaintiff: Charles D Bauer
Defendant: Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv03046
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Charles D Bauer, filed.(Hagans, William)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Joint Request to extend filing of Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan ( Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 10/31/2019.)(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence - Extension request by Charles D Bauer, filed.(Hagans, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Schulz, Karl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Charles D Bauer, filed.(Hagans, William)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 9/30/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles D Bauer, filed.(Hagans, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller , filed by Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas. (Schulz, Karl)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22987818) filed by Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer v. Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D Bauer
Represented By: William Fred Hagans
Represented By: Kendall C Montgomery
Represented By: Vincent Lee Marable, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Karl A Schulz
Represented By: Joseph A Ziemianski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?