Johnson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Defendant: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Dexter Darnell Johnson
Case Number: 4:2019cv03047
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition. Johnson will amend his federal petition within sixty days from the entry of this Order.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to #4 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition, filed by Dexter Darnell Johnson. (Graf, Jessica)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition, filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Stewart-Klein, Ellen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition by Dexter Darnell Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schepers, Jeremy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Stewart-Klein on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. (Stewart-Klein, Ellen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Graf on behalf of Dexter Darnell Johnson, filed. (Graf, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-22987920) filed by Dexter Darnell Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Combined Appendix, #3 Exhibit In re Johnson, #4 Proposed petition filed in Fifth Circuit)(Schepers, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Ellen Stewart-Klein
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dexter Darnell Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Don Schepers
Represented By: Jessica Alice Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?