Natixis Funding Corporation v. Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC
Plaintiff: Natixis Funding Corporation
Defendant: Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC
In Re: GenOn Mid-Atlantic Development, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03078
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 APPENDIX re: #15 Response by Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Compendium of Authority)(Clement, Zack)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #5 Objections to Report and Recommendations , filed by Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clement, Zack)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Tessa Brianne Harvey as to Natixis Funding Corporation re: #7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (YeseniaIbarra, 7)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Ravi S. Shankar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Natixis Objection to Report and Recommendation. GenMA opposition due 10/3/2019; Plaintiff Natixis Funding shall file its reply by 10/17/2019, )(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Natixis Objection to Report and Recommendation by Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Clement, Zack)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Ravi S. Shankar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clement, Zack)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zack A. Clement on behalf of Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clement, Zack)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Tessa B. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Neil S. Binder to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 APPENDIX re: #5 Objections to Report and Recommendations by Natixis Funding Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Appendix Declaration of Neil S. Binder, #3 Appendix Exhibit A, #4 Appendix Exhibit B, #5 Appendix Exhibit C, #6 Appendix Exhibit D, #7 Appendix Compendium of Authorities)(Beckham, Charles)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #1 Report and Recommendations, filed by Natixis Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Beckham, Charles)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Tessa B. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natixis Funding Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Beckham, Charles)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Neil S. Binder to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natixis Funding Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Beckham, Charles)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference as to Bankruptcy Case No. 18-03409 by Natixis Funding Corporation, filed. Originally docketed on 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) #2 Docket Sheet) (ShoshanaArnow, 4).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for Withdrawal of Reference.(Signed by David R Jones) (ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natixis Funding Corporation v. Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genon Mid-Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: Stephen C Hackney
Represented By: Benjamin Fader Cooper
Represented By: Kelsey Bleiweiss
Represented By: Ravi Subramanian Shankar
Represented By: William E Arnault
Represented By: Zack Allen Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: GenOn Mid-Atlantic Development, LLC
Represented By: Zack Allen Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natixis Funding Corporation
Represented By: Martin Tomas Murphy
Represented By: Wendy H Schwartz
Represented By: Charles A Beckham, Jr
Represented By: Neil Stephen Binder
Represented By: Tessa Brianne Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?