Prosperity Settlement Funding, Inc. et al v. Van Dyke et al
Plaintiff: Robert M. Press, Prosperity Settlement Funding, Inc. and Anzar Settlement Funding Corp.
Defendant: Anglo-Dutch Energy L.L.C., Anglo-Dutch Petroleum International, Inc., Scott V Van Dyke, Theresa M Van Dyke and Anglo-Dutch (Tenge) LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03082
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Referring Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference as to Bankruptcy Case No. 19-3545 by Anglo-Dutch Energy L.L.C., Scott V Van Dyke, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2019. Originally docketed on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Response by Anzar Settlement Funding Corp., Robert M. Press, Prosperity Settlement Funding, Inc., #3 Docket Sheet)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for Withdrawal of Reference signed by Judge Jeffrey P Norman.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prosperity Settlement Funding, Inc. et al v. Van Dyke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Press
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prosperity Settlement Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anzar Settlement Funding Corp.
Represented By: Julie Goodrich Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo-Dutch Energy L.L.C.
Represented By: Jett Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo-Dutch Petroleum International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott V Van Dyke
Represented By: Jett Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa M Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo-Dutch (Tenge) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?