Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC et al v. RBEX, Inc. d/b/a Apple Towing Co. et al
Plaintiff: Texas Partners Holdings, L.P., Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC and Thomas Balke
Defendant: RBEX, Inc. d/b/a Apple Towing Co., Gary Blankenship, in his official capacity as U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Texas, RBEX, Inc. and Gary Blankenship
Case Number: 4:2019cv03085
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANT RBEX, INC. D/B/A APPLE TOWING CO.S MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES DEFENDANT RBEX, INC. D/B/A APPLE TOWING CO.S MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES by RBEX, Inc., filed.(Welscher, Craig)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT DEFENDANT RBEX, INC. D/B/A APPLE TOWING CO.S MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES by RBEX, Inc., filed.(Welscher, Craig)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion to Consolidate, filed by Gary Blankenship. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Vela, Jose)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion to Consolidate by Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Nonsuit in state court case, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Temporary Restraining Order filed in state court, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Consolidate)(Flynn, Jared)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Gary Blankenship, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gary Blankenship, filed.(Vela, Jose)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC, Texas Partners Holdings, L.P., filed. (Flynn, Jared)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC, filed.(Flynn, Jared)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal for the following reason: Agreement of the Judges. Judge Andrew S Hanen no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by RBEX, Inc., filed.(Welscher, Craig)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corrected Answer by Gary Blankenship, filed.(Vela, Jose)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Gary Blankenship, filed.(Vela, Jose)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 190th Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-54680 () filed by Gary Blankenship, in his official capacity as U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit state notice of removal, #6 Exhibit index of state court filings, #7 Exhibit list of counsel of record, #8 Exhibit state court docket sheet, #9 Exhibit state court filings, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vela, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC et al v. RBEX, Inc. d/b/a Apple Towing Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBEX, Inc. d/b/a Apple Towing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Blankenship, in his official capacity as U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Texas
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBEX, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Allen Welscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Blankenship
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Partners Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Jared Grattan Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Creek Land and Cattle Company, LLC
Represented By: Jared Grattan Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Balke
Represented By: Jared Grattan Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?