Rome v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arnell Rome
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03110
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have up to and including October 28, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Extension to October 28, 2019)(Madriz, Meghaan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019, filed.(Jones, Audia)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arnell Rome, filed.(Jones, Audia)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc., filed.(Jones, Audia)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23018013) filed by Arnell Rome. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jones, Audia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rome v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Meghaan C Madriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnell Rome
Represented By: Audia Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?