Green v. Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC
Plaintiff: Todd J Green
Defendant: Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03141
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Philip Kontul to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Philip K. Kontul to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Smith, Lawrence)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC, filed.(Smith, Lawrence)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC, filed.(Smith, Lawrence)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (Answer due 10/16/2019 for Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC). It is further ORDERED that the statute of limitations shall be tolled during the 30 day period of extension. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Defendant's Response Deadline by Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seaton, Samantha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(Bohrer, Philip)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Brady on behalf of Todd J Green, filed. (Brady, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC, filed.(Bohrer, Philip)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23034163) filed by Todd J Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bohrer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC
Represented By: Samantha Danielle Seaton
Represented By: Lawrence David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd J Green
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?