Truck Zon, LLC v. Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Truck Zon, LLC
Defendant: Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03154
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed.(Conder, Dennis)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Box by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed.(Conder, Dennis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Truck Zon, LLC, filed.(Brown, Nicholas)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
August 23, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company due to blank form. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23039342) filed by Truck Zon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truck Zon, LLC v. Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis D Conder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Zon, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Graham Gibson
Represented By: Nicholas Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?