Bourgeois v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carl Bourgeois
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03159
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:19-cv-08196; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern District of Texas. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/22/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(mp)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7540420) filed by Carl Bourgeois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Randolph James Amaro, Jr added to party Carl Bourgeois(pty:pla).(Amaro, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourgeois v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Bourgeois
Represented By: Randolph James Amaro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?