Finister v. Burger King Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Erica Finister, As Next Friend of A.E. and Erica Finister
Defendant: Houston Fly, LLC, Burger King Corporation, Houston Foods, Inc. and Brandon Dukes
Case Number: 4:2019cv03172
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re: Stipulation of Proper Defendant by Burger King Corporation, Houston Foods, Inc., filed.(Anand, Nehal)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brandon Dukes re: #5 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney,, filed. (RTS; No Longer at this Address)(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brandon Dukes re: #2 Notice in a Removed or Transferred Case - FORM - Hughes, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Substitution granting #4 . Jacob M. Monty and Ruth M. Willars are withdrawn as counsel for Burger King, Houston Fly, and Houston Foods. Nehal Anand and Chris James are substituted as counsel. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Nehal Anand in place of Jacob Monty by Burger King Corporation, Houston Fly, LLC, Houston Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel)(Willars, Ruth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Removal by Burger King Corporation, Houston Fly, LLC, Houston Foods, Inc., filed.(Willars, Ruth)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District 234th Court, case number 2019-48291 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23045669) filed by Burger King Corporation, Houston Foods, Inc., Houston Fly, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Willars, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finister v. Burger King Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Fly, LLC
Represented By: Ruth Monty Willars
Represented By: Nehal Shah Anand
Represented By: Christopher T James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Represented By: Ruth Monty Willars
Represented By: Nehal Shah Anand
Represented By: Christopher T James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Ruth Monty Willars
Represented By: Nehal Shah Anand
Represented By: Christopher T James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Finister, As Next Friend of A.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Finister
Represented By: Kimberley Marules Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?