Ali v. Contreras et al
Petitioner: Shujaat Ali
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr, Joseph Smith, Mark Morgan, Kevin McAleenan and Patrick Contreras
Case Number: 4:2019cv03217
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - this lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee. Case terminated on 10/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Petitioner Ali Shujaat, a/k/a Shujaat Ali, is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee, or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified copy of his current detainee trust account statement, within thirty days from date of this order. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agarcia, 7)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Shujaat Ali. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(agarcia, 7)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Contreras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shujaat Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?