Jackson et al v. Credit Systems International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jackson and Tonia Jackson
Defendant: Credit Systems International, Inc. and Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group
Case Number: 4:2019cv03279
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Answer or Other Response due by 11/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Credit Systems International, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Malone, Robbie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Pursuant to Rule 38 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, St. Lukes demands a jury trial on all issues so triable. by Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group, filed.(Frontz, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group, filed.(Frontz, Matthew)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint (Answer due by 10/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frontz, Matthew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth Jackson, Tonia Jackson, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Credit Systems International, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group, Credit Systems International, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hcarr, 4)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group, Credit Systems International, Inc., filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Kenneth Jackson, Tonia Jackson, filed. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Kenneth Jackson, Tonia Jackson, filed. (Volheim, Nathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group, Credit Systems International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23084879) filed by Tonia Jackson, Kenneth Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Credit Systems International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Systems International, Inc.
Represented By: Robbie LuAnn Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor St. Lukes Medical Group
Represented By: Matthew Russell Frontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jackson
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Jackson
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?