Aries Building Systems, LLC v. VANGUARD UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Plaintiff: Aries Building Systems, LLC
Defendant: VANGUARD UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Case Number: 4:2019cv03307
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aries Building Systems, LLC, filed.(Dickson, Kyle)
September 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to Vanguard University of Southern California,. Issued summons returned to attorney in person, filed.(olindor, 4)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Vanguard University of Southern California, filed.(Dickson, Kyle)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VANGUARD UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23092879) filed by Aries Building Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickson, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aries Building Systems, LLC v. VANGUARD UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANGUARD UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aries Building Systems, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Lesley Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?