Johnson v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: emmitt w johnson
Defendant: FDIC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03316
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 DISMISSAL. Having been advised that Emmit W. Johnson stipulates to dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice #8 . Case terminated on 10/14/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal (Agreed))(Yow, Rebecca)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruhuju Vasavada on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, filed. (Yetter, R)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order granting Motion to Dismiss)(Yow, Rebecca)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Yow, Rebecca)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Removal by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Lewis, William)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fort Bend County District Court, 458th, case number 19-DCV-265302 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23102863) filed by FDIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Yetter, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: emmitt w johnson
Represented By: Rhonda Shedrick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDIC
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?