Lantern Maritime Company v. Chembulk Trading II LLC
Plaintiff: Lantern Maritime Company
Defendant: Chembulk Trading II LLC and Chembulk Ocean Transport, LLC
Garnishee: Exxonmobile Chemical Interamerica Inc., Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA Inc., E D & F Man Liquid Products LLC, BP Amoco Corporation, Lyondell Chemical Company, YARA North America Inc., ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., Covestro LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company, Mitsubishi International Corp., Shell Chemical LP, Kolmar Americas, Inc., Mitsubishi Chemical Composites America, Inc., ICOF America Inc. and BP Amoco Chemical Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03385
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Archer Daniels Midland Company, filed. (Mouledoux, Marcelle)
October 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Dismissal as to BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Amoco Corporation, Covestro LLC by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Simms, J)
October 18, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE - Amended - Mitsubishi International Corp. Not Dismissed, Correction of [EC 26] re: #26 Notice of Dismissal by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Simms, J)
October 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Lyondell Chemical Company, Mitsubishi Chemical Composites America, Inc., Mitsubishi International Corp., Shell Chemical LP, YARA North America Inc. by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Simms, J)
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE Proof of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
October 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE Proof of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Proof of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE Proof of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Writ of Garnishment.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Archer Daniels Midland Company, filed. (Mouledoux, Marcelle)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 PMAG - Chevron as to Chembulk Ocean, #3 PMAG - Chevron as to Chembulk Trading, #4 PMAG - Odin Marine as to Chembulk Ocean, #5 PMAG - Odin Marine as to Chembulk Trading, #6 PMAG - SABIC as to Chembulk Ocean, #7 PAMG - SABIC as to Chembulk Trading)(Simms, J)
September 25, 2019 15 Writ of Garnishment Issued (), filed.(sanderson, 4)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Ex Parte MOTION/Request for Writ of Garnishment. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court is authorized to issue the Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment attached to the Request. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 PMAG - ADM, #2 PMAG - BP Amoco Chemical, #3 PMAG - BP Amoco Corp, #4 PMAG - Covestro, #5 PMAG - ED&F Man, #6 PMAG - Exxon Chemical Europe, #7 PMAG - Exxon Chemical Interamerica, #8 PMAG - ICOF, #9 PMAG - Kolmar, #10 PMAG - Lyondell, #11 PMAG - Mitsibishi Chemical, #12 PMAG - Mitsubishi International, #13 PMAG - Shell Chemical, #14 PMAG - Total Petro, #15 PMAG - YARA)(Simms, J)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chembulk Trading II LLC, Chembulk Ocean Transport, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company, BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Amoco Corporation, Covestro LLC, E D & F Man Liquid Products LLC, ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., Exxonmobile Chemical Interamerica Inc., ICOF America Inc., Kolmar Americas, Inc., Lyondell Chemical Company, Mitsubishi Chemical Composites America, Inc., Mitsubishi International Corp., Shell Chemical LP, Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA Inc., YARA North America Inc. filed by Lantern Maritime Company. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Lantern Maritime Company.(Simms, J)
September 23, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date 9/17/2019 re: 11 Document(s) Sent, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/27/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J Stephen Simms for Lantern Maritime Company. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Lift Temporary Stay; plaintiffs motion states that conditions under which this case was sealed have been met. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the file and postthe pleadings to the docket. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Lift Temporary Stay. by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2019. (sanderson, 4)
September 16, 2019 15 Writ of Garnishments Issued (), filed.(emathis, 4)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Striking Document re: #4 MOTION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document is not signed; The Motion does not comply with Judge Miller's procedures regarding motions for pro hac vice (See Rule 5.E.). (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Appointment for Service of Process of Maritime Garnishment. It is ORDERED, that J. Stephen Simms or any other person at least 18 years of age, and not a party to this action, appointed by J. Stephen Simms be and hereby is, appointed to serve Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, along with a copy of the Verified Complaint. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment granting #5 Motion for Writ of Garnishment.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Chembulk Trading II LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(emathis, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment for Service of Process of Maritime Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(emathis, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #5 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed.(emathis, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(emathis, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lantern Maritime Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Original document submitted unsigned.) (emathis, 4) *** STRICKEN pursuant to #10 Order of Court ***
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Sealed Case. Notice mailed to: Lantern Maritime Company, filed. (emathis, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lantern Maritime Company, filed.(emathis, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chembulk Trading II LLC filed by Lantern Maritime Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to Seal Case, #3 Order Granting SeaL)(emathis, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lantern Maritime Company v. Chembulk Trading II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chembulk Trading II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chembulk Ocean Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lantern Maritime Company
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Exxonmobile Chemical Interamerica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: E D & F Man Liquid Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BP Amoco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Lyondell Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: YARA North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Covestro LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Archer Daniels Midland Company
Represented By: Marcelle P Mouledoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Mitsubishi International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Shell Chemical LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Kolmar Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Mitsubishi Chemical Composites America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: ICOF America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BP Amoco Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?