Walker v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Denise Walker
Defendant: Richard Byrd Smith, 747 Express and Richard Smith
Case Number: 4:2019cv03422
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Richard Smith, filed.(Ryan, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting as to #5 Notice of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Resetting as to #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Resetting as to #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4) Modified on 9/18/2019 (wbostic, 4).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by 747 Express, Richard Byrd Smith, filed.(Ryan, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th District Court Harris County, case number 2019-60659 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23150872) filed by Richard Byrd Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ryan, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Byrd Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 747 Express
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey B Musslewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?