Buehler v. Head
Plaintiff: Antonio Buehler
Defendant: Lt. Daren Head
Case Number: 4:2019cv03430
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:19-cv-00188; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND TRANSFERRING CASE re #20 Report and Recommendations, #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Daren Head. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
August 26, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (td)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Daren Head. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 10/15/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Daren Head. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Callan, Jennifer)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Joint Report on Conference and Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan by Daren Head (Callan, Jennifer)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order Pursuant to Rule 16 by Daren Head. (Callan, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Jennifer F. Callan and Marjorie Leigh Cohen for Daren Head. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Daren Head. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callan, Jennifer)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Antonio Buehler; REFERRING MOTION: #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daren Head. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (td)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Daren Head, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Daren Head (Amis, Brian)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Antonio Buehler, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Daren Head (Thompson, Millie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(td)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Daren Head, re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Antonio Buehler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Amis, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Daren Head. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Amis, Brian)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Antonio Buehler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit w Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Email)(Thompson, Millie)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Daren Head. (lt)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Antonio Buehler. (Thompson, Millie) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/28/2019 to flatten form) (lt).
February 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Antonio Buehler. (cj)
February 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Daren Head amending, filed by Antonio Francis Buehler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Thompson, Millie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11816795), filed by Antonio Francis Buehler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Thompson, Millie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buehler v. Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Buehler
Represented By: Millie L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Daren Head
Represented By: Jennifer F Callan
Represented By: Brian Amis
Represented By: Marjorie Leigh Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?