GREER v. CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN W. GREER
Defendant: CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., FirstService Residential Houston, Inc., Nicholas Adam Pugh and Slater Pugh, LTD, LLP
Case Number: 4:2019cv03436
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Russ, Adam)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 First MOTION to Dismiss , filed by BRIAN W. GREER. (Trevino, Lu Ann)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by BRIAN W. GREER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Trevino, Lu Ann)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by BRIAN W. GREER. (Trevino, Lu Ann)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by BRIAN W. GREER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Trevino, Lu Ann)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re: #4 First MOTION to Dismiss , filed.(Godkin, Gregory)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., filed.(Russ, Adam)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FirstService Residential Houston, Inc., filed.(Godkin, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BRIAN W. GREER, filed.(Trevino, Lu Ann)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss by FirstService Residential Houston, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2019. (Godkin, Gregory)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/27/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Russ, Adam)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Court, case number 2019-44611 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23162034) filed by CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Russ, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREER v. CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARPENTERS LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Adam Jonathan Russ
Represented By: Melanie R Cheairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstService Residential Houston, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Godkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Adam Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slater Pugh, LTD, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN W. GREER
Represented By: Lu Ann Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?