Horton et al v. Central Loan Administration and Reporting et al
Plaintiff: Delaina S Brown-Horton and Joseph M Horton
Defendant: AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd, Central Loan Administration and Reporting, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 4:2019cv03456
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Sam)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Central Loan Administration and Reporting served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019, filed.(JenniferOlson, 4)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Eskridge, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-4. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge Lynn N Hughes no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joseph M Horton, Delaina S Brown-Horton.(jdav, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 attachment, #2 attachment)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Central Loan Administration and Reporting (Cenlar Agency, Inc.) Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Delaina S Brown-Horton, Joseph M Horton, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re: #6 Amended Complaint by Delaina S Brown-Horton, Joseph M Horton, filed. (gclair, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd, Central Loan Administration and Reporting, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Joseph M Horton, Delaina S Brown-Horton. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Delaina S Brown-Horton, Joseph M Horton.(gclair, 4)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit re: RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Central Loan Administration and Reporting served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit re: RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU091088, filed. (gclair, 4)
September 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd, Central Loan Administration and Reporting. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(gclair, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd, Central Loan Administration and Reporting filed by Joseph M Horton, Delaina S Brown-Horton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(gclair, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton et al v. Central Loan Administration and Reporting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd
Represented By: Sam David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Loan Administration and Reporting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaina S Brown-Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?