In Re: Von Directional Services, LLC
Trustee: Ronald J. Sommers, Trustee
In Re: Von Directional Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03463
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. This case is transferred to Judge Gray Miller for all future proceedings. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller for the following reason: Judge Andrew S Hanen no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #1 Report and Recommendations, filed by Performance Drilling Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bonham, Louis)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Power on behalf of Ronald J. Sommers, Trustee, filed. (Power, Aaron)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua W. Wolfshohl on behalf of Ronald J. Sommers, Trustee, filed. (Wolfshohl, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference as to Bankruptcy Case No. 18-3346, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2019. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Reference(Signed by David R Jones) Parties notified.(SamanthaWarda, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Von Directional Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Ronald J. Sommers, Trustee
Represented By: Aaron J Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Von Directional Services, LLC
Represented By: Edward L Rothberg
Represented By: Vianey Garza
Represented By: Melissa A Haselden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?