Kook v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Soonhyeok Kook
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03491
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Soonhyeok Kook, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Schexnyder, LaDonna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Schexnyder, LaDonna)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-59634 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23183790) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Items Being Filed, #4 State Court Record, #5 List of all Parties and Counsel of Record, #6 Certificate of Interested Parties, #7 Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Schexnyder, LaDonna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kook v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soonhyeok Kook
Represented By: Christopher Jerrod Leavitt
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: LaDonna Grey Schexnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?