Miller v. Cadence Bancorporation et al
Plaintiff: Frank Miller
Defendant: Paul B. Murphy, Valerie C. Toalson, Cadence Bankcorporation and Cadence Bancorporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03492
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-03492 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-04269 by Cadence Bancorporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pecht, Gerard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cadence Bancorporation, Paul B. Murphy, Valerie C. Toalson, filed.(Pecht, Gerard)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended ORDER on Extension. Cadence Bancorporation, Paul B. Murphy, and Valerie C. Toalson may file an answer after the lead plaintiff is selected and after the timetable for filing an amended complaint is set #12 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on Extension. Cadence Bancorporation may file an answer after the lead plaintiff is selected and after the timetable for filing an amended complaint is set #12 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file an Answer by Cadence Bancorporation, Paul B. Murphy, Valerie C. Toalson, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pecht, Gerard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Sessions on behalf of Cadence Bancorporation, Paul B. Murphy, Valerie C. Toalson, filed. (Sessions, Ellen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard G. Pecht on behalf of Cadence Bancorporation, Paul B. Murphy, Valerie C. Toalson, filed. (Pecht, Gerard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Stokes on behalf of Cadence Bancorporation, Paul B. Murphy, Valerie C. Toalson, filed. (Stokes, Peter)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn N Hughes. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge David Hittner recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Frank Miller, filed.(Kendall, Joe)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Kendall, Joe)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Sworn Certification of Plaintiff - Attachment to Dkt. 1 by Frank Miller, filed.(Kendall, Joe)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23183919) filed by Frank Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kendall, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Cadence Bancorporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul B. Murphy
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Gerard G Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie C. Toalson
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Gerard G Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Bankcorporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Bancorporation
Represented By: Ellen B Sessions
Represented By: Gerard G Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Miller
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?