Taplin v. Storm Water Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Taplin
Defendant: Storm Water Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03495
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Storm Water Solutions, LLC, filed.(Muskat, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Storm Water Solutions, LLC, filed.(Muskat, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Storm Water Solutions, LLC served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019, filed.(Cowan, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF CONSENT OF BRIAN MCGILBRA by Charles Taplin, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent of Brian McGilbra)(Cowan, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Charles Taplin, filed.(McGregor, Katie)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Storm Water Solutions, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Storm Water Solutions, LLC, filed.(Cowan, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Storm Water Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23184186) filed by Charles Taplin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taplin v. Storm Water Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Taplin
Represented By: Robert W Cowan
Represented By: Katie Rose McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storm Water Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Michael James Muskat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?