Orozco et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Orozco, Fernando Orozco, Isabella Orozco, Juan Orozco and Cindia Garcia
Defendant: Tommie Vaughn Motors, Inc. d/b/a Tommie Vaughn Ford and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03498
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to by Ford Motor Company, filed. (Mennucci, William)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Original Complaint and Defendant FMC's First Amended Answer.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re: Filing Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Cindia Garcia, Fernando Orozco, Isabella Orozco, Juan Orozco, Sergio Orozco, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Midlo, Bennett)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney William L. Mennucci in place of George A. Kurisky, Jr. by Tommie Vaughn Motors, Inc. d/b/a Tommie Vaughn Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kurisky, George)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ford Motor Company, filed.(Mennucci, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Ford Motor Company, filed.(Mennucci, William)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Ford Motor Company, filed.(Mennucci, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st JDC, Harris County, TX, case number 2019-43898 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23185810) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Tab 1, #4 Tab 2, #5 Tab 3, #6 Tab 4, #7 Tab 5, #8 Tab 6, #9 Tab 7, #10 Tab 8, #11 Tab 9, #12 Tab 10)(Mennucci, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Orozco
Represented By: Bennett Avram Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Orozco
Represented By: Bennett Avram Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Orozco
Represented By: Bennett Avram Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Orozco
Represented By: Bennett Avram Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindia Garcia
Represented By: Bennett Avram Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie Vaughn Motors, Inc. d/b/a Tommie Vaughn Ford
Represented By: George Anthony Kurisky, Jr
Represented By: William L. Mennucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: William L. Mennucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?