Newman et al v. Arens et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Newman and Casey Newman
Defendant: Arens Services, LLC and Shannon Arens
Case Number: 4:2019cv03509
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 RECEIPT of Transfer received via Email Notification re: transfer of case to Western District of Texas. New Case # assigned: 1:19-cv-01102 and received on 11/13/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
November 8, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of TX. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 11/08/2019, filed. (gkelner, 4)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of TX.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shannon Arens, Arens Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Raval, Amar)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas by Shannon Arens, Arens Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue)(Raval, Amar)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shannon Arens, Arens Services, LLC, filed.(Raval, Amar)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shannon Arens, Arens Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2019. (Raval, Amar)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Casey Newman, Stephanie Newman, filed.(Reeves, Bradley)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Shannon Arens served on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/15/2019, filed.(Reeves, Bradley)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Arens Services, LLC served on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/15/2019, filed.(Reeves, Bradley)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shannon Arens, Arens Services, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Reeves, Bradley)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23191713) filed by Casey Newman, Stephanie Newman.(Reeves, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman et al v. Arens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Newman
Represented By: Bradley Jordan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Newman
Represented By: Bradley Jordan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arens Services, LLC
Represented By: Amar Bharat Raval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Arens
Represented By: Amar Bharat Raval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?