Lawrence v. A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Lawrence
Defendant: A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC and James Sheppeard
Case Number: 4:2019cv03526
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Justin Lawrence, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Consent Form)(Brady, Scott)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Justin Lawrence, filed.(Tran, Trang)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent by Justin Lawrence, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form for Michael Jones)(Tran, Trang)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to by A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC, filed. (Ward, A.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC, filed.(Ward, A.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Justin Lawrence, filed.(Tran, Trang)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Trang Q. Tran on behalf of Justin Lawrence, filed. (Tran, Trang)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to James Sheppeard served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019, filed.(Brady, Scott)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019, filed.(Brady, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Bohrer on behalf of Justin Lawrence, filed. (Bohrer, Philip)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to James Sheppeard)(rcastro, 4)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(rcastro, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to James Sheppeard, filed.(Brady, Scott)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC, filed.(Brady, Scott)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23203435) filed by Justin Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Brady, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Cleaning & Septic Systems, LLC
Represented By: A. Lewis Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sheppeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lawrence
Represented By: Scott Earl Brady
Represented By: Trang Q Tran
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?