Bowers v. BackChina, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: BackChina, LLC. and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 4:2019cv03544
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BackChina, LLC., filed.(Ramey, William)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to BackChina, LLC. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019, filed.(Higbee, Mathew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RubenCastroadi, 4)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/27/2019 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(RubenCastroadi, 4)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BACKCHINA, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rcastro, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to BACKCHINA, LLC, filed.(Higbee, Mathew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIC BOWERS (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23212129) filed by ERIC BOWERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. BackChina, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BackChina, LLC.
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Mathew K. Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?