Evans et al v. Enterprise Products Partners LP et al
Plaintiff: Mary Evans and Don Weston Dorrell
Defendant: CenterPoint Energy, Oiltanking Partners LP and Enterprise Products Partners LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv03555
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 34 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #33 Reply to Response to Motion, by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Daniels, Douglas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Remand, filed by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Daniels, Douglas)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AGREED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
November 13, 2019 Filing 30 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed.(McNiel, D)
November 13, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION re: Agreed Stipulation and Protective Order by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed.(McNiel, D)
November 8, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Remand filed by CenterPoint Energy. (Buthod, Tynan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 MOTION to Remand, filed by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Noble, Stephanie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. The Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 3:00 PM is cancelled, filed. (aboyd, 4)
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP. (McNiel, D)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by CenterPoint Energy. (McElvy, Kathryn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Paranjpe, Tej)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Paranjpe, Tej)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8-A, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8-B, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8-C, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #22 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Paranjpe, Tej)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea A. Zarikian on behalf of Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed. (Paranjpe, Tej)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Bivona on behalf of Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed. (Paranjpe, Tej)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Tour on behalf of Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed. (Tour, Sabrina)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Daniels on behalf of Don Weston Dorrell, Mary Evans, filed. (Tour, Sabrina)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CenterPoint Energy identifying CenterPoint Energy, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Buthod, Tynan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed.(McNiel, D)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebeca Aizpuru Huddle on behalf of CenterPoint Energy, filed. (Buthod, Tynan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. McDougald on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (Kim, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Kim on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (Kim, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service in a Removed Action by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed.(McNiel, D)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Noble on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (Noble, Stephanie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke A. Noble on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (Noble, Brooke)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Mizell on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (Mizell, Patrick)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ferguson McNiel on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (McNiel, D)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Hoffman on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. (Hoffman, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Enterprise Products Partners LP, Oiltanking Partners LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mizell, Patrick)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by CenterPoint Energy, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buthod, Tynan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th Judicial District Court Harris County Texas, case number 2019-57694 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23216912) filed by Enterprise Products Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Noble, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Enterprise Products Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenterPoint Energy
Represented By: Kathryn Dawson McElvy
Represented By: Tynan Buthod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oiltanking Partners LP
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Noble
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: John Hooshik Kim
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Products Partners LP
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Noble
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: John Hooshik Kim
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Evans
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Represented By: Tej R Paranjpe
Represented By: Sabrina Rebecca Tour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Weston Dorrell
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Represented By: Tej R Paranjpe
Represented By: Sabrina Rebecca Tour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?