Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System
Case Number: 4:2019cv03603
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Anand, Nehal)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed.(Van Oostenrijk, Lloyd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Anand, Nehal)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Memorial Hermann Health System. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Van Oostenrijk, Lloyd)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Memorial Hermann Health System filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Van Oostenrijk, Lloyd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(RubenCastroadi, 4)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memorial Hermann Health System filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Oostenrijk, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System
Represented By: Nehal Shah Anand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Lloyd Stefanus Van Oostenrijk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?