Toledo v. HCA Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO
Defendant: Rio Grande Regional Hospital, Inc., EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC., BAY VIEW REHABILITATION AT MERCY HOSPITAL, PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL L.P., MOUNTAIN VIEW HOSPITAL, INC., SUNRISE MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL, INC., HCA-HEALTHONE, LLC, Gulf Coast Division, Inc., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., Houston Northwest Medical Center Inc, EASTSIDE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF VIRGINIA, INC., MIDAMERICA DIVISION, INC., SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, MIDWEST DIVISION-MMC, LLC, NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, TULANE MEDICAL CENTER, EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD, LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER MOB, LLC, WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-ST. MARK'S HOSPITAL, LLC, NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA/ALLEGHANY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., OU MEDICAL CENTER EDMOND, COLISUM NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL, TRISTAR STONECREST MEDICAL CENTER, ST. DAVID'S NORTH AUSTIN MEDICAL CENTER, REDMOND PARK HOSPITAL, LLC, MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-CACHE VALLEY, LLC, FAWCETT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., ST. DAVID'S HEALTHCARE PARTNERSHIP, LLP, SOUTH ATLANTIC DIVISION, INC., Bayshore Medical Center Inc, SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., COLISEUM HEALTH GROUP, INC., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL GOOD SAMARITAN HEALTH SYSTEM L.P., HCA HEALTH SERVICES FLORIDA, INC., MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., ST. DAVID'S ROUND ROCK MEDICAL CENTER, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, TRISTAR ASHLAND CITY MEDICAL CENTER, LARGO MEDICAL CENTER, INC., METROPOLITAN METHODIST HOSPITAL, LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL CITY FORT WORTH, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, COLLETON MEDICAL ARTS, LLC, OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC., SPAULDING REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, MONTGOMERY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., TRISTAR SOUTHERN HILLS MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, Swedish Medical Center, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, ST. DAVID'S REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, METHODIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF SAN ANTONIO, LLP, COLISEUM REHABILITATION CENTER, CONROE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, TRISTAR CENTENNIAL MEDICAL CENTER, Mainland Medical Center Inc, MEDICAL CITY DALLAS HOSPITAL, INC., PARKRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MIDWEST DIVISION-RMC, LLC, OU MEDICAL CENTER, Methodist Hospital, BAY HOSPITAL, INC., WESLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HCA HOLDINGS, INC., TOMBALL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH TEXAS DIVISION, INC., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., TULANE LAKESIDE HOSPITAL FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, Clear Lake Regional Medical Center Inc, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD.,, CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER-DOCTORS REGIONAL, MEDICAL CITY LEWISVILLE, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN/ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.C., WOMEN'S & CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, West Houston Medical Center, MEDICAL CITY ARLINGTON, GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF OKLAHOMA, INC., TERRE HAUTE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, L.P., TRISTAR SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, ST. DAVID'S HOSPITAL GEORGETOWN HOSPITAL, SUNRISE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL, HTI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, WEST FLORIDA PPH, LLC, KINGWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HENDERSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, TRISTAR HEALTH SYSTEM, INC, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., LEWISGALE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, Medical City Dallas Hospital, HCA HEALTH SERVICES FLORIDA, INC. doing business as BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER, SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF SARASOTA, SUNRISE MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL, WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., doing business as WEST FLORIDA HOSPITAL, NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as LAKE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HENDERSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TRISTAR HENDERSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as OCALA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, REDMOND PARK HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as REDMOND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC. doing business as JOHN RANDOLPH MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH TEXAS DIVISION, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CITY HEALTHCARE, SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE, MONTGOMERY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as LEWISGALE HOSPITAL MONTGOMERY, COLLETON MEDICAL ARTS, LLC doing business as COLLETON MEDICAL CENTER, GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC. doing business as ALASKA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CONROE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as Conroe Regional Medical Center, CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA/ALLEGHANY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as LEWISGALE HOSPITAL ALLEGHANY, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL GOOD SAMARITAN HEALTH SYSTEM L.P. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, Medical City Dallas Hospital doing business as MEDICAL CITY HOSPITAL, OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as RAULERSON HOSPITAL, NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF TRINITY, EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GULF COAST REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC. doing business as PARKLAND MEDICAL CENTER, LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as LAWNWOOD PHYSICAL REHABILITATION CENTER, MIDAMERICA DIVISION, INC. doing business as WOMEN'S & CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, WEST FLORIDA PPH, LLC doing business as PALMS OF PASADENA HOSPITAL, CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TRISTAR HORIZON MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNTAIN VIEW HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as MOUNTAIN VIEW HOSPITAL-PAYSON, MIDWEST DIVISION-RMC, LLC doing business as RESEARCH MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-CACHE VALLEY, LLC doing business as CACHE VALLEY HOSPITAL, MIDWEST DIVISION-MMC, LLC doing business as MENORAH MEDICAL CENTER, HTI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TRISTAR SKYLINE MEDICAL CENTER, EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD doing business as LAS PALMAS REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, SOUTH ATLANTIC DIVISION, INC. doing business as FAIRVIEW PARK HOSPITAL, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF VIRGINIA, INC. doing business as PARHAM DOCTORS' HOSPITAL, LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER MOB, LLC doing business as LOS ROBLES HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as KENDALL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD., doing business as UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER and Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc.
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv03683
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order of USCA Per Curiam re: #77 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 21-20620. The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED, filed. (SaraCelis, 1)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 5/1/2023 re: #77 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 21-20620. IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, filed. (SaraCelis, 1)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: #77 Notice of Appeal. The electronic record on CD is being sent to Daniel J Copes c/o Clarisse Christine Toledo via Intake pick up. (USCA No. 21-20620), filed. (hlerma, 4) Modified on 4/21/2022 (hlerma, 4).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: #77 Notice of Appeal. The electronic record on CD is being sent to Plaintiff- Clarisse Christine Toledo via in person pick up at intake . (USCA No. 21-20620), filed. (DahlilaRodriguez, 1)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #77 Notice of Appeal to Attorney Sarah Beth. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 21-20620), filed.(DahlilaRodriguez, 1)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Clarisse Christine Toledo. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes This order form relates to the following: #77 Notice of Appeal, filed.(mperez, 1)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER on Withdrawal. Anita M. Chambers, R. Scott Oswald, John E. Chapoton, Jr., and Gwyneth Campbell are fully withdrawn as counsel for Toledo #82 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST - This order form relates to the following: #77 Notice of Appeal No Party or Information Provided, filed.(RachelSalazar, 4)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Anita M. Chambers, R. Scott Oswald, and the law firm The Employment Law Group, P.C. (TELG), and John E. Chapoton, Jr., Gwyneth Campbell, and Chapoton, Sanders, & Scarborough LLP (Co-Counsel) to Withdraw as Attorney by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2021. (Chambers, Anita)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 21-20620 re: #77 Notice of Appeal, filed.(rnieto, 1)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER on Costs. Toledo's motion to stay is denied #75 . Toledo's objections to Bayshore's bill of costs are overruled #76 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE to #75 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Related to Bill of Costs filed by Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc.. (Patterson, Nancy)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OBJECTIONS to #76 Objections to Defendant's Bill of Costs, filed by Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc.. (Patterson, Nancy)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #77 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): K. Miller; N. Forrest & H. Alcaraz, filed. (Attachments: #1 NOA, #2 DKT-13) (dnoriega, 1)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: #77 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 3, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #73 Final Judgment, by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505, receipt number HOU105773 re: #77 Notice of Appeal, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OBJECTIONS to #74 Bill of Costs , filed by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO. (Chambers, Anita)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Related to Bill of Costs by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chambers, Anita)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $11,021.30 by Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINAL JUDGMENT. Toledo takes nothing from HCA Healthcare, Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, and Bayshore Medical Center #65 . Toledo's motion for partial summary judgment is denied #64 . Case terminated on 10/26/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION on Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY in Support of #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Patterson, Nancy)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY in Support of #64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Toledo, Christine Dep. Excerpts Redacted, #2 Exhibit BAYSHOREToledo000863 Redacted, #3 Exhibit Toledo0013843 Redacted, #4 Exhibit Capps, Carrie Dep. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit BAYSHOREToledo000916, #6 Exhibit BAYSHOREToledo000847, #7 Exhibit BAYSHOREToledo000882 Redacted)(Chambers, Anita)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to Seal. Exhibits 2, 12, 13 to Toledo's response to the defendants' motion for summary judgment are sealed #68 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2, 12, and 13 to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Nancy)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def. Answer to RFA, #2 Exhibit Toledo Dep., #3 Exhibit Rozell Dep., #4 Exhibit Capps Dep., #5 Exhibit Entin Dep., #6 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000847, #7 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000882, #8 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000863, #9 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000916, #10 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000968, #11 Exhibit Turner Dep., #12 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000170, #13 Exhibit Simmons Dep., #14 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo001168, #15 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo001148, #16 Exhibit BAYSHORE/Toledo000822)(Chambers, Anita)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE to #64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Patterson, Nancy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HCA HOLDINGS, INC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF)(Patterson, Nancy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2021. (ghassan, 4)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. Toledo's motion for partial summary judgment is accepted #62 . By 10/8/2021, HCA Healthcare may respond. By 10/15/2021, Toledo may reply. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Chambers, Anita)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Extension ORDER. By 9/17/2021, HCA Healthcare and Bayshore Medical Center may move dispositively #60 . By 10/8/2021, Toledo may respond. By 10/15/2021, HCA and Bayshore may reply. Internal review set for 10/18/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Briefing Schedule by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2021. (Chambers, Anita)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER to Move. By 7/16/2021, HCA Healthcare and Bayshore Medical may move dispositively. By 8/6/2021, Toledo may respond. By 8/13/2021, HCA and Bayshore may reply. Internal review set for 8/16/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STATUS REPORT by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed.(Chambers, Anita)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER to Report. By 2/19/2021, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. Internal review set for 2/22/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Discovery ORDER. By 11/20/2020, Toledo must give HCA Healthcare her social security statement and earnings report. Toledo may depose: a corporate representative of HCA Healthcare, Mark Rozell, Carrie Capps, and Misty Turner. Once the depositions are completed, the parties must jointly report the next steps to advance this litigation. Internal review set for 1/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 11/4/2020. Order to be entered. Appearances: Anita Chambers, Sarah Morton. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz) (ghassan, 4)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STATUS REPORT by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed.(Chambers, Anita)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER to Disclose. By 10/16/2020 Toledo must furnish all ordered information to HCA Healthcare. By 10/16/2020 HCA Healthcare must furnish all ordered information to Toledo. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn N Hughes. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/29/2020. Order to be entered. Appearances: Sarah Beth Morton, Anita Mazumdar Chambers.(Court Reporter: Forrest), filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Management ORDER. By 9/4/2020, Toledo must give HCA Healthcare and Pasadena Bayshore Hospital the executed third-party records authorizations. Her objections are overruled. The court will rule on the requests for depositions and technicians at the next conference. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STATUS REPORT by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed.(Chambers, Anita)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Management ORDER terminating #46 . By 7/31/2020, Toledo may depose Kathryn Simmons, Demetra Bevins, and Ohme Entin. HCA Healthcare and Pasadena Bayshore Hospital may request third party records and must file a statement once they have received them. By 6/5/2020, the parties may each serve fifteen interrogatories, fifteen requests for admissions, and fifteen requests for production of documents. By 8/7/2020, the parties must jointly report the status of their discovery and settlement discussions. Internal review set for 8/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Opposed MOTION for Discovery by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chambers, Anita)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STATUS REPORT by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed.(Chambers, Anita)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Bayshore Medical Center Inc, filed.(Patterson, Nancy)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bayshore Medical Center Inc, HCA HOLDINGS, INC. filed by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.).(Chambers, Anita)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Protecting Confidentiality. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Management ORDER. By 2:00 p.m. on 12/6/2019, Toledo may amend her complaint to correct the names of the defendants and add her second claim. By 12/31/2019, Toledo must give HCA Healthcare and Pasadena Bayshore Hospital the information ordered. By 1/24/2020, HCA and Bayshore may depose Toledo. By 1/31/2020, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 12/3/2019. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 2/3/2020. Appearances: Anita Chambers, John Chapoton, Nancy Patterson, Sarah Morton. (Court Reporter: K. Miller) (ghassan, 4)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Resetting Conference terminating #38 . Initial Conference reset for 12/3/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Conference by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO(United States of America ex rel.), filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chambers)(Campbell, Gwyneth)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion for R. Scott Oswald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Anita Mazumdar Chambers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Morton on behalf of Bayshore Medical Center Inc, HCA HOLDINGS, INC., filed. (Morton, Sarah)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy L. Patterson on behalf of HCA HOLDINGS, INC., filed. (Patterson, Nancy)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for R. Scott Oswald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Campbell, Gwyneth)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Anita Mazumdar Chambers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Campbell, Gwyneth)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gwyneth A. Campbell; John E. Chapoton Jr. on behalf of CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO, filed. (Campbell, Gwyneth)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlson, 4)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Columbia. Case Number 1:17-cv-02856; received electronically
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, pursuant to the Court Order entered 9/17/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer venue, Dkt. #27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The case shall by transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. (Transfer due by 9/27/2019.). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/17/2019. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 9/17/2019 to add the word "Minute" in front of "Order" to the entry text(zkt).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC, HCA HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nes, William)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC, HCA HOLDINGS, INC..(Nes, William)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #25 Summons Returned Executed; emailed to achambers@employmentlawgroup.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do not refile. Duplicate of docket entry no. #23 . (ztd, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Chambers, Anita) Modified on 9/4/2019 (ztd).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a responsive pleading or dispositive motion on or before 9/11/2019. (kt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #18 Amended Complaint by BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC, HCA HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nes, William)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion for extension, Dkt. #24 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading or dispositive motion on or before September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/27/2019. (lcrdm2, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chambers, Anita)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HCA HOLDINGS, INC. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chambers, Anita)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to HCA HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Chambers, Anita)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HCA HOLDINGS, INC., BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC with Jury Demand filed by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline)(Chambers, Anita)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for extension of time, Dkt. 17, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. Plaintiff shall effect service of the summons and complaint in this matter on or before August 12, 2019. Plaintiff is cautioned, however, that she has already had at least two months to locate counsel. Any future extension, accordingly, will be granted only upon a showing of substantial diligence and reason to believe that Plaintiff will be able to locate counsel with additional time. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/6/2019. (lcrdm2, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall effect service of the summons and complaint in this matter on or before 8/12/2019. (kt)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion to withdraw, Dkt. 15, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Joel M. Androphy, Janis G. Gorton, and Rebecca L. Gibson of Berg & Androphy are hereby granted leave to withdraw. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/29/2019. (lcrdm2, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/28/2019. (lcrdm2, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Androphy, Joel)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING COUNTS I, II, AND III OF PLAINTIFF/RELATOR'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/18/2019. (Counsel have been notified by first class mail.)(zkt)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, that the complaints be unsealed and served upon the defendants by relator; it is further ORDERED, that all other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendants, except for the Complaint, this Order, and the Government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention; it is further ORDERED, that the seal is hereby lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2019. (Counsel have been notified by first class mail.) (zkt)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Case Unsealed pursuant to Order #13 . See Order for details. (ztd)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616088864) with Jury Demand filed by CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) Modified on 1/10/2018 (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toledo v. HCA Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Grande Regional Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY VIEW REHABILITATION AT MERCY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAIN VIEW HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA-HEALTHONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Division, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Northwest Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTSIDE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF VIRGINIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDAMERICA DIVISION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST DIVISION-MMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TULANE MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER MOB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-ST. MARK'S HOSPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA/ALLEGHANY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OU MEDICAL CENTER EDMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLISUM NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAR STONECREST MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. DAVID'S NORTH AUSTIN MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDMOND PARK HOSPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-CACHE VALLEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAWCETT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. DAVID'S HEALTHCARE PARTNERSHIP, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH ATLANTIC DIVISION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayshore Medical Center Inc
Represented By: William B. Nes
Represented By: Sarah Beth Morton
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLISEUM HEALTH GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL GOOD SAMARITAN HEALTH SYSTEM L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES FLORIDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. DAVID'S ROUND ROCK MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAR ASHLAND CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARGO MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN METHODIST HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CITY FORT WORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLETON MEDICAL ARTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPAULDING REHABILITATION HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAR SOUTHERN HILLS MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. DAVID'S REHABILITATION HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METHODIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF SAN ANTONIO, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLISEUM REHABILITATION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONROE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAR CENTENNIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainland Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CITY DALLAS HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST DIVISION-RMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OU MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methodist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: William B. Nes
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Sarah Beth Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMBALL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH TEXAS DIVISION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TULANE LAKESIDE HOSPITAL FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Lake Regional Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER-DOCTORS REGIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CITY LEWISVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESBYTERIAN/ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOMEN'S & CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Houston Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CITY ARLINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF OKLAHOMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRE HAUTE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAR SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. DAVID'S HOSPITAL GEORGETOWN HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST FLORIDA PPH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINGWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENDERSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISTAR HEALTH SYSTEM, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWISGALE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical City Dallas Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES FLORIDA, INC. doing business as BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF SARASOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., doing business as WEST FLORIDA HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOTAMI HOSPITALS OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as LAKE CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENDERSONVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TRISTAR HENDERSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as OCALA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDMOND PARK HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as REDMOND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC. doing business as JOHN RANDOLPH MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH TEXAS DIVISION, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CITY HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as LEWISGALE HOSPITAL MONTGOMERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLETON MEDICAL ARTS, LLC doing business as COLLETON MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC. doing business as ALASKA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONROE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as Conroe Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA/ALLEGHANY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as LEWISGALE HOSPITAL ALLEGHANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL GOOD SAMARITAN HEALTH SYSTEM L.P. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical City Dallas Hospital doing business as MEDICAL CITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKEECHOBEE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as RAULERSON HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW PORT RICHEY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF TRINITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN IDAHO HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GULF COAST REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC. doing business as PARKLAND MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as LAWNWOOD PHYSICAL REHABILITATION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDAMERICA DIVISION, INC. doing business as WOMEN'S & CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST FLORIDA PPH, LLC doing business as PALMS OF PASADENA HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TRISTAR HORIZON MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAIN VIEW HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as MOUNTAIN VIEW HOSPITAL-PAYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST DIVISION-RMC, LLC doing business as RESEARCH MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAINSTAR MEDICAL GROUP-CACHE VALLEY, LLC doing business as CACHE VALLEY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST DIVISION-MMC, LLC doing business as MENORAH MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TRISTAR SKYLINE MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD doing business as LAS PALMAS REHABILITATION HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH ATLANTIC DIVISION, INC. doing business as FAIRVIEW PARK HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF VIRGINIA, INC. doing business as PARHAM DOCTORS' HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER MOB, LLC doing business as LOS ROBLES HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENDALL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as KENDALL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, LTD., doing business as UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Bayshore Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARISSE CHRISTINE TOLEDO
Represented By: Rebecca L. Gibson
Represented By: Joel M Androphy
Represented By: Anita Mazumdar Chambers
Represented By: Janis G. Gorton
Represented By: Gwyneth A Campbell
Represented By: John E Chapoton, Jr
Represented By: R Scott Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?