Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Offshore Marine Contractors Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Offshore Marine Contractors Inc.
Garnishee: Arena Offshore LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv03750
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Setting as to #9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix List, #2 Appendix Appendix A, #3 Appendix Appendix B, #4 Appendix Appendix C, #5 Appendix Appendix D, #6 Appendix Appendix E, #7 Appendix Appendix F, #8 Appendix Appendix G, #9 Appendix Appendix H, #10 Appendix Appendix I, #11 Appendix Appendix J, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Statman, Katriel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Arena Offshore LP, filed. (Ayer, Mitchell)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Arena Offshore LP, filed. (Ayer, Mitchell)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Christopher Hannan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Christopher Hannan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2019. (Statman, Katriel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Raimy D. Eymard, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohman, Martin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service Executed as to Arena Offshore, LP on 10/8/19 re: Writ of Garnishment, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Harry Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Harry E. Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Bohman, Martin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. (Bohman, Martin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ of Garnishment.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) (Attachments: #1 Writ) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison(Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Statman, Katriel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Offshore Marine Contractors Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23274116) filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Statman, Katriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Offshore Marine Contractors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Marine Contractors Inc.
Represented By: Harry Edson Morse
Represented By: Martin Stewart Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Arena Offshore LP
Represented By: Mitchell E Ayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Katriel Chaim Statman
Represented By: Christopher M Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?