Lopez Rodriguez v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Robert Ismael Lopez Rodriguez
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan, Rodolfo Karisch, Michael J. Pitts, John P. Sanders and Carla Provost
Case Number: 4:2019cv03769
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael J. Pitts re: #2 Order to Answer, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 10/23/2019 re: 5 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (jdav, 4)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Eleanor Robinson-Gaithes re: 3 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (scastillo, 1)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dismissing #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. Case terminated on 10/16/2019 (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 15, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) In Transit re: 4 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
October 15, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) In Transit re: 3 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Rodolfo Karisch, Kevin K. McAleenan, Michael J. Pitts, Carla Provost, John P. Sanders by Robert Ismael Lopez Rodriguez, filed. (Solis, Manuel)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR AN ANSWER. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-23278774) filed by Robert Ismael Lopez Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Solis, Manuel) Modified on 10/2/2019 (LoriPurifoy, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Rodriguez v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Karisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Provost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ismael Lopez Rodriguez
Represented By: Manuel E Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?