Peters v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Michael Geoffrey Peters
Defendant: Ashley England, Texas Medical Board, Lorie Davis, State of Texas, Barbara Gladden Adamick, FNU Black, Shelly Baldwin, Deanna Williamson, Rick Perry, Cathy Busa, Irvin Zeithler and FNU King
Case Number: 4:2019cv03808
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 41 Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 6:18-cv-00464; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel, subject to reconsideration in the event it later appears that appointment of counsel is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/30/2019. (mjc, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #19 Report and Recommendations, and PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TRANSFER. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Dr. Irvin Zeithler, former Governor Rick Perry, and the State of Texas are DISMISSED with prejudice as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Cathy Busa and Barbara Adamick are SEVERED from this lawsuit and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, for such other and further proceedings as that court may deem appropriate. Signed by District Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2019. (mjc, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #16 Report and Recommendations, and denying #9 Motion for Scheduling and Federal Protection filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters, #4 Motion for TRO filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters, and #5 Motion for a Court Order filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters. Signed by District Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2019. (mjc, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of receipt of courtesy copy of Notice of Appeal filed with the Fifth Circuit and return of the Amended Complaint #8 for copies by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint #8 )(mjc, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #33 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Michael Geoffrey Peters. Filing fee $ 505.00 not paid. (mjc, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Geoffrey Peters on 9/23/2019 as to #33 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, summonses, Amended Complaint #8 and instructions. (mjc, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Shelly Baldwin, FNU Black, Lorie Davis, Ashley England, FNU King and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Black, #2 Summons(es) - Davis, #3 Summons(es) - England, #4 Summons(es) - King)(mjc, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Subpoenas, construed as a motion for re-issuance of summons. Clerk shall re-issue the summons forms for Defendants Audrey England, Shelly Baldwin, Captain Black, Ricky King, and Lorie Davis, and shall deliver these to the Plaintiff with an acknowledgment card for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/16/2019. (mjc, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/16/2019. (gsg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Subpoenas by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE/COMPLIANCE to #28 Order by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Geoffrey Peters on 9/4/2019 as to #28 Order. (mjc, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER extending deadline to 10/31/2019 to serve remaining defendants signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/30/2019. (ksd )
May 2, 2019 Filing 27 DEFINITION AND CLARIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #25 Notice of filing exhibits. Exhibits sealed re medical records and information pertaining to minor child. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Continued, #2 Exhibits Continued, #3 Exhibits Continued)(mjc, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of filing exhibits by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Geoffrey Peters on 4/5/2019 as to #20 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Hearing, #19 Report and Recommendations, and summons. (mjc, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendations by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, ) Modified on 7/22/2019 (mjc, ).
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Geoffrey Peters on 3/29/2019 as to #16 Report and Recommendations, #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (mjc, )
April 3, 2019 Mailed R&R #19 , Order #20 and two copies each of the five summons to Pltf with ack card. (mjc, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued as to Shelly Baldwin, FNU Black, Lorie Davis, Ashley England, FNU King. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - England, #2 Summons(es) - Black, #3 Summons(es) - King, #4 Summons(es) - Davis)(mjc, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #17 Motion for court assistance in obtaining addresses and Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. ORDERED that the Clerk shall correct the summons forms for the Defendants Baldwin, England, Black, King, and Davis, and return them to the Plaintiff for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/2/2019. (mjc, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters, recommending that the Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Irvin Zeithler, former Governor Rick Perry, and the State of Texas be dismissed with prejudice for purposes of proceeding in forma pauperis as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. It is further recommended that the claims against Cathy Busa and Barbara Adamick be severed out of this lawsuit and transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/2/2019. (mjc, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Geoffrey Peters on 3/12/2019 as to #11 Order, 12 blank summons forms, local civil rules, and pro se guidelines. (mjc, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Court assistance in obtaining names and addresses, MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (Attachments: #1 Summonses)(mjc, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of #9 MOTION filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters, #5 MOTION for Court Order filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/19/2019. (mjc, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and for relief from retaliation. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/19/2019. (mjc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 STATE CORRUPTION AND JUDICIAL MALFEASANCE by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding issuance of summons for #1 Complaint filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/7/2019. (gsg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Letter re status of case from Michael G. Peters. Mailed docket sheet. (mjc, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION Requesting Scheduling and Federal Protection by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters.(mjc, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Relief from Retaliation, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (mjc, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Sanctions by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (Attachments: #1 Commissary & Trust Fund, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Cover Letter/Envelope)(gsg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Court Order by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(saenz, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Geoffrey Peters. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(saenz, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES. Case reassigned to District Judge Richard A. Schell for all further proceedings. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/2/2018. (saenz, )
September 10, 2018 Tendered paperwork relating to the filing fee payment to finance for a refund of the overpayment. (mjc, )
September 7, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number 6-43507. (mjc, )
September 5, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent form mailed to Plaintiff. (mjc, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mjc, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barbara Gladden Adamick, Shelly Baldwin, Cathy Busa, State of Texas, Texas Medical Board, Deanna Williamson, filed by Michael Geoffrey Peters.(mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Gladden Adamick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Busa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin Zeithler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geoffrey Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?