Logue v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Wood Logue
Defendant: Wells%20Fargo%20Bank%2C%20N.A. and Specialized%20Loan%20Servicing%2C%20LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03824
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Resetting **TIME CHANGE ONLY**. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #21 REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #11 Notice (Other) , filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Sheppard, Branch)
November 19, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's Answer to Specialized Loan Servicing LLC's Counterclaims by Cindy Wood Logue, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Setting as to #21 REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #11 Notice (Other). Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 11:15 AM in by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 [**DISREGARD - SEE DKT #23 **]NOTICE of Setting as to #21 REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #11 Notice (Other). Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 11:15 AM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #11 Notice (Other), filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER striking #18 Motion to Remand for failure to comply with the Court's procedures.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Cindy Wood Logue, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 (**STRICKEN**) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Cindy Wood Logue, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Krolikowski, Kurt)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Boylan, Eric)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Cindy Wood Logue, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Partial Dismissal on Plaintiff's #6 Notice of Dismissal (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Removal (AMENDED) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Sheppard, Branch)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Lis Pendens by Cindy Wood Logue, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Morel Mortgage, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Cindy Wood Logue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Cindy Wood Logue, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Partial Dismissal)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Removal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Lewis, William)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cindy Wood Logue, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Removal by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23302187) filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheppard, Branch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logue v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells%20Fargo%20Bank%2C%20N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized%20Loan%20Servicing%2C%20LLC
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Wood Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?