County of Burleson v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: County of Burleson
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Walmart Inc., Actavis, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma Inc., Brookshire Brothers, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt PLC, Brookshire Brothers, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03845
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #18 Reply to Response to Motion by County of Burleson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sanford, Shelly)
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Drukker Stratigopoulos on behalf of County of Burleson, filed. (Stratigopoulos, Meredith)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #14 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Scofield, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by County of Burleson. (Sanford, Shelly)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 Opposed RESPONSE to #14 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Burleson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Watts, Mikal)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Pltf's First Amended Petition. The deadlines for Walmart Inc. and Brookshire Brothers, Inc. to answer,move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Petition are extended to and including thirty (30) days from the later of: ( 1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL (Case No. 2804); or (2) entry of an order with this Court's ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brookshire Brothers, Inc., filed.(Ballard, Jack)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 SURREPLY to #7 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, filed by County of Burleson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Watts, Mikal)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of #7 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition filed by County of Burleson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watts, Mikal)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCleary, Roger)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition( Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019.) by Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Scofield, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, SPECGX LLC, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by County of Burleson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Watts, Mikal)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by County of Burleson, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Sanford, Shelly)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, Texas, case number 2018-77087 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23307702) filed by Walmart Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scofield, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Burleson v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Jack D Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Burleson
Represented By: Meredith Drukker Stratigopoulos
Represented By: Shelly A. Sanford
Represented By: Mikal C Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?