Discount Truck Parts & Tires, LLC v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Discount Truck Parts & Tires, LLC
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03848
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed. (Conder, Dennis)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Discount Truck Parts & Tires, LLC, filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Services in Romoved Action by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed.(Conder, Dennis)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed.(Conder, Dennis)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 295th District Court, case number 2019-58952 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23308282) filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit)(Conder, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discount Truck Parts & Tires, LLC v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis D Conder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discount Truck Parts & Tires, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Graham Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?