Loyaly et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sophia Loyaly and Bedford Loyaly
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03861
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bedford Loyaly, Sophia Loyaly, filed.(McClelland, Shane)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindoradi, 4)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 400th Judicial District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 19-DCV-265805 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23314410) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Items Being Filed, #4 Certified State Court Record, #5 List of Parties and Counsel of Record, #6 Certificate of Interested Parties, #7 Notice of Removal to State Court)(Schexnyder, LaDonna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyaly et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Loyaly
Represented By: Shane A McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedford Loyaly
Represented By: Shane A McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: LaDonna Grey Schexnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?