Visual Comfort of America LLC v. Safavieh, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Visual Comfort of America LLC
Defendant: Jonathan Y Designs and Safavieh, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03933
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2019. (Ferdinand, Edmund)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed.(Ferdinand, Edmund)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jonathan Y Designs, Safavieh, Inc. filed by Visual Comfort of America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pearce, Andrew)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Mark S. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jonathan Y Designs served on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Safavieh, Inc. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Mark S. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Y Designs, Safavieh, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Oathout, Monica)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of Edmund J. Ferdinand, III as attorney in charge of Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed. (Pearce, Andrew)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Edmund J. Ferdinand, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SarahShelbyadi, 4)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Y Designs, Safavieh, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jonathan Y Designs, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Safavieh, Inc., filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Edmund J. Ferdinand, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2019. (Pearce, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23346372) filed by Visual Comfort of America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Pearce, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visual Comfort of America LLC v. Safavieh, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Y Designs
Represented By: Mark Samuel Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safavieh, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Samuel Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visual Comfort of America LLC
Represented By: Andrew Delatin Pearce
Represented By: Whitney Brieck
Represented By: Edmund J Ferdinand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?