K.P. v. Allergan, Inc et al
Plaintiff: K.P.
Defendant: Allergan PLC, Allergan Inc. and Allergan USA Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03973
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to All Defendants due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Allergan Inc., Allergan USA Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Staples, William)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 15, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Allergan Inc., Allergan USA Inc. due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to K.P., filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons)(Staples, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Reference List Pursuant to SD Tex Gen Order 2004-11 by K.P., filed. (Staples, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allergan Inc., Allergan USA Inc., Allergan PLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23358987) filed by K.P..(Staples, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.P. v. Allergan, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.P.
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?