Fricks v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Fred Fricks
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04022
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Conditional DISMISSAL. Having been advised the parties have settled, this case is dismissed with prejudice #5 . By 1/10/2020, the parties may move for reinstatement. Case terminated on 11/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION for to Enter Judgment by Fred Fricks, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Wayne)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 113th Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-67597 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23377139) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Burke, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fricks v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Fricks
Represented By: Wayne D Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Melinda Ruth Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?