AIN Partners, Inc, et al. v. Barr, et al.
Plaintiff: AIN PARTNERS INC, RAJ ALI VALLIANI and AIN Partners Inc.
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY, William P. Barr, RICHARDSON GREGORY, DAVID PEKOSKE and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 4:2019cv04078
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AIN Partners Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED)(Seehar, Imdad)
November 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney and Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
November 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Gregory Richardson, David Pekoske. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION/COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23390819.) filed by AIN PARTNERS INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Exhibit DENIAL OF VISA PETITION, #3 Exhibit ETA LABOR CERTIFICATION, #4 Exhibit I-797 RECEIPT OF I-140, #5 Exhibit I-797 RECEIPT OF I-485, #6 Exhibit RFE ISSUED, #7 Exhibit NOID ISSUED, #8 Exhibit RESPONSE TO NOID, #9 Exhibit RESPONSE TO NOID, #10 Exhibit RESPONSE TO NOID, #11 Exhibit RESPONSE TO NOID, #12 Exhibit RESPONSE TO NOID, #13 Exhibit I-485 OF APPLICANT)(Seehar, Imdad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIN Partners, Inc, et al. v. Barr, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIN PARTNERS INC
Represented By: Imdad Aliraza Seehar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJ ALI VALLIANI
Represented By: Imdad Aliraza Seehar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIN Partners Inc.
Represented By: Imdad Aliraza Seehar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARDSON GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PEKOSKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?